Trustees ERB'S PALSY GROUP
Charity number: 1157720

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN WENDY HILLYER | Chair | 01 November 1994 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Spurway | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Prichard | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kim Hawksby | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Trudi Hole | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Swift | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE SALLY DEWDNEY | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
CLAIR ANNE HEMMING | Trustee | 23 October 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.