Trustees BEAT THE COLD
Charity number: 1159027

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LESLEY BENTLEY | Chair | 11 January 1998 |
|
|
||||
Stuart James Allen | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew George Wilshaw | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Margaret Wileman | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Harold Stow | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHAELA FYSON | Trustee | 08 November 2010 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.