Accounts and annual returns WILMSLOW HALF MARATHON

Charity Number: 1158220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 22 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 18 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 18 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 12 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 04 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 04 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 05 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 05 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window