Trustees WILMSLOW HALF MARATHON

Charity Number: 1158220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Martin Norris Trustee 16 February 2023
None on record
Martin Stocker Trustee 12 September 2019
None on record
Roy Pownall Trustee 03 February 2019
None on record
Nicky Mowat Trustee 30 June 2016
None on record
ANTHONY KERSH Trustee 10 July 2014
None on record