Accounts and annual returns BRIDGE BUILDERS MENTORING

Charity number: 1158629
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 September 2024 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 16 February 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 03 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 03 November 2021 On Time
Annual return 01 October 2020 07 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2020 Not Required