Accounts and annual returns THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL ALEXANDRA AND WAR MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (KNOWN AS RHYL LEAGUE OF HOSPITAL FRIENDS)
Charity number: 504978
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2008 | 22 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2007 | 09 November 2007 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2006 | 18 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2005 | 15 September 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2005 | 18 July 2006 | 259 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window