Financial history THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL ALEXANDRA AND WAR MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (KNOWN AS RHYL LEAGUE OF HOSPITAL FRIENDS)

Charity number: 504978
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2004 01/01/2005 01/01/2006 01/01/2007 01/01/2008
Total gross income £2.34k £2.72k £2.01k £2.33k £2.06k
Total expenditure £278 £2.98k £3.67k £1.35k £1.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A