Financial history THE PRI 2 MERCIAN REGIMENT

Charity Number: 1158358
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 05/12/2022
Total gross income £87.78k £90.37k £64.35k £111.41k £29.27k
Total expenditure £101.97k £94.16k £60.67k £115.39k £160.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A