Accounts and annual returns EPILEPSY LIFESTYLE

Charity number: 1158587
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 16 September 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 16 September 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 16 September 2021 15 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 September 2021 15 July 2022 On Time
Annual return 16 September 2020 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 September 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Annual return 16 September 2019 21 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 September 2019 02 April 2020 On Time