Trustees SEAFORD MUSEUM & HERITAGE SOCIETY
Charity number: 1158790

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Andrew Grimble | Trustee | 15 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
GAIL ROSEMARY ARMSTRONG | Trustee | 15 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Marie Finlay | Trustee | 15 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH CONSTANCE MARR | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julian Richard Purkis | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Christine Lawson | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barry Malcolm Leigh | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Selina Ruth White | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas David Hing | Trustee | 13 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Patricia Haggis | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.