Financial history JAMES HIRONS

Charity Number: 1161904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £990.80k £806.71k £814.42k £936.33k £1.02m
Total expenditure £902.35k £989.61k £1.06m £1.24m £1.35m
Income from government contracts £143.92k £26.21k £34.01k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £55.29k £29.52k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.38k £4.22k £4.33k £376 £385
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £866.77k £698.74k £689.56k £799.76k £883.33k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £124.03k £107.97k £120.53k £136.09k £131.34k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £108 £152
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £882.70k £969.09k £1.03m £1.22m £1.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds £19.66k £20.53k £23.63k £21.52k £20.01k
Expenditure - Governance £882.70k £969.09k £7.76k £8.56k £9.55k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £40.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £19.66k £20.53k £23.63k £21.52k £20.01k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0