Financial history WALKLEY CARNEGIE LIBRARY

Charity Number: 1159745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £53.61k £57.05k £17.33k £19.18k £19.25k
Total expenditure £76.40k £15.68k £14.89k £14.02k £18.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.93k £55.70k N/A £16.46k £15.96k