Governing document The Sevenoaks CPR Charity

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 NOV 2014 AS AMENDED ON 29/01/2015 AS AMENDED ON 28 MAR 2019 AS AMENDED ON 19 FEB 2020 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14 APR 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES IN THE SEVENOAKS DISTRICT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING FREE PUBLIC CARDIOPULMONARY RESUSCITATION (CPR) AND AUTOMATIC EXTERNAL DEFIBRILATOR (AED) TRAINING AND THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AED PUBLIC ACCESS DEFIBRILLATOR (PAD) SITES IN THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
IN THE SEVENOAKS DISTRICT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.