Financial history REDEEMED CAMP

Charity number: 1162733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £38.90k £54.14k £70.14k £78.89k £102.67k
Total expenditure £25.86k £24.63k £26.35k £56.51k £68.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A