Accounts and annual returns GRASSROOT MOVEMENT IN NEPAL UK

Charity number: 1163803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 07 August 2024 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 07 August 2024 465 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 May 2022 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 18 May 2021 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 10 May 2020 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required