Financial history GRASSROOT MOVEMENT IN NEPAL UK

Charity number: 1163803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £1.38k £709 £105 £105 £18
Total expenditure £396 £1.20k £100 £458 £791
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A