Accounts and annual returns SHOTTERMILL JUNIOR SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1161679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 November 2023 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 April 2022 280 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 April 2022 645 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required