Accounts and annual returns THE INDIAN EDUCATION SOCIETY, LEICESTER

Charity number: 506316
Charity reporting is up to date (194 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 11 December 2024 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 01 February 2024 246 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 29 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 01 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 28 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required