Accounts and annual returns EAST HARTFORD AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 506484
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2016 02 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2015 23 May 2016 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 23 May 2016 23 days late
Annual return 30 June 2014 16 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 16 April 2015 On Time