Accounts and annual returns OUR COMMUNITY (OUR CO...).

Charity number: 1164621
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 July 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 February 2024 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 04 February 2024 4 days late
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 September 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 September 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 October 2020 On Time