Financial history OUR COMMUNITY (OUR CO...).

Charity number: 1164621
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £32.69k £40.23k £35.63k £48.42k £44.45k
Total expenditure £39.40k £29.34k £42.00k £47.17k £51.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.14k N/A N/A N/A