Accounts and annual returns 69ERS' YOUTH CLUB OF CUDDINGTON AND SANDIWAY

Charity number: 506669
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 29 March 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 25 February 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2014 11 March 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2013 17 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not Required