Financial history 69ERS' YOUTH CLUB OF CUDDINGTON AND SANDIWAY

Charity number: 506669
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2012 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016
Total gross income £7.75k £2.94k £6.77k £641 £1.00k
Total expenditure £5.09k £7.46k £3.30k £3.38k £2.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A