Trustees FULHAM SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1163234
Charity reporting is overdue by 916 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lorna Abeeda Khan Alvaranga Trustee 20 January 2020
None on record
Heather Kutwasi Trustee 04 September 2019
None on record
Irene Ann Cooper Trustee 10 March 2017
None on record
Tracey Samantha Ellerby Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record
MARIA CAROLINE WILSON Trustee 06 March 2015
None on record
DEREK DELVES Trustee 10 March 2010
None on record
CAROL HELEN JONES Trustee 06 March 2005
None on record
WENDY ANNIE KAY WILTSHIRE Trustee 15 March 2001
None on record