Accounts and annual returns CHRIST LEADERSHIP CHURCH INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 1164667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 October 2023 25 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 27 October 2022 26 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 27 October 2021 26 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 27 October 2020 23 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 27 October 2019 27 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 October 2019 Not Required