Trustees THE CORNERSTONE TRUST

Charity Number: 507105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV Gary Brown Chair 12 March 2014
None on record
Suzanne Cooper Trustee 05 September 2017
None on record
Rev Robert Jackson Trustee 05 May 2016
None on record
Ken Frazer Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
Rev FERGUS TOM PEARSON WI Trustee 24 December 2012
None on record