Financial history YORK LITERATURE FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1165936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £32.90k £1.23k £11.14k £24.77k £32.95k
Total expenditure £24.01k £9.15k £8.04k £17.34k £30.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A