Accounts and annual returns VISTA TWISTERS

Charity number: 1169065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 31 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 19 September 2023 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 September 2023 111 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 25 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 27 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 27 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 27 July 2020 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 27 July 2020 57 days late Download Open in new window