Financial history VISTA TWISTERS

Charity Number: 1169065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £153.38k £158.58k £118.30k £271.96k £325.37k
Total expenditure £121.87k £162.76k £122.82k £258.09k £313.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.94k £25.00k N/A N/A £5.50k