Financial history NEW BREED CHRISTIAN PALACE

Charity Number: 1169559
Charity reporting is overdue by 58 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023
Total gross income £35.71k £49.76k £59.75k £15.10k £58.49k
Total expenditure £36.57k £53.92k £56.62k £23.45k £55.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £7.08k £31.05k £3.18k N/A