Financial history COMMUNITY EMERGENCY RESPONSE TEAM LIMITED

Charity number: 1166201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £780 £9.71k £3.20k £10.71k £5.27k
Total expenditure £540 £7.94k £6.91k £8.85k £7.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A