Trustees YORKSHIRE COAST FAMILIES

Charity number: 1167417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GUY MICHAEL BAUMANN Chair 12 September 2017
None on record
Amanda Jayne Short Trustee 20 March 2025
CLOSER COMMUNITIES
Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days
Louise Baron Trustee 20 March 2025
None on record
Louise Bulman Trustee 20 February 2025
None on record
Kirsty Marie McFinnigan Trustee 20 February 2025
None on record
Sandra Wright Trustee 20 February 2025
None on record
Katy Agars Trustee 20 February 2025
None on record
Richard Oldale Trustee 18 May 2021
None on record
Nicola Winspear Trustee 14 November 2018
None on record
Elizabeth Hepworth Trustee 12 September 2017
None on record
Claire Garton Trustee 06 December 2016
None on record