Financial history FRIENDS OF THE POTTERIES MUSEUM AND ART GALLERY, STOKE ON TRENT

Charity number: 507834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £15.24k £5.20k £37.88k £18.74k £12.81k
Total expenditure £15.85k £12.82k £39.87k £8.34k £17.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £11.60k £2.90k