Trustees ENSBURY PARK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1168501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BERNIE CULVER Chair 15 October 2013
None on record
Jill Reade Trustee 20 July 2023
None on record
JACK JOHN HAMLET Trustee 13 April 2021
None on record
Karen Doran Trustee 18 September 2018
None on record
Desmond Bailey Trustee 12 January 2017
None on record
KATIE CHALDECOTT-GILL Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record
BRYAN LAWRENCE Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record