Financial history SHEDDINGDEAN BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1168341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £140.88k £109.25k £99.07k £91.88k £108.64k
Total expenditure £143.79k £386.22k £81.67k £55.12k £54.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £630 N/A