Trustees SHEDDINGDEAN BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1168341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Eric Pollard Trustee 22 November 2022
None on record
Susan Jenkinson Trustee 22 November 2022
None on record
Gillian Davison Trustee 22 November 2022
None on record
Valerie Batten Dando Trustee 23 November 2021
None on record
DEBORAH McDONALD Trustee 27 November 2018
None on record
MRS Sylvia Lewis Trustee 28 November 2017
None on record
COLIN ALLEN Trustee 27 November 2014
None on record