Accounts and annual returns HUBBERSTON AND HAKIN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1168883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 May 2024 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 May 2024 103 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 February 2023 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 February 2023 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window