Trustees HUBBERSTON AND HAKIN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1168883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JEAN ROBERTS Trustee 11 June 2024
None on record
PAUL ROBINSON Trustee 11 June 2024
None on record
SUSAN COUNCIL Trustee 11 June 2024
None on record
Adrian Jones Trustee 14 June 2023
None on record
Susan Patricia Twigg Trustee 30 November 2022
None on record
Peter Abel Llewellyn Trustee 24 April 2018
None on record
Jacqueline Davies Trustee 22 February 2018
None on record
Pam McGillivray Trustee 14 September 2017
None on record
NORMA BARLOW Trustee 08 December 2016
None on record
Lynda Mary Jones Trustee 08 December 2016
None on record