Accounts and annual returns PLYMOUTH HEARTBEAT

Charity number: 1168079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 30 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 30 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 30 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 30 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 01 September 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 01 September 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 01 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 01 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 28 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 28 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window