Accounts and annual returns GET EDUCATION LTD

Charity number: 1168126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 29 April 2024 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 29 April 2024 151 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 14 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 14 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 17 December 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required