Financial history GET EDUCATION LTD

Charity number: 1168126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £18.90k £25.94k £43.37k £27.93k £16.00k
Total expenditure £20.71k £29.31k £49.86k £27.57k £22.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A