Financial history THE SAMARITANS OF DORSET AT WEYMOUTH

Charity number: 1168117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £40.24k £47.43k £42.20k £55.66k £57.64k
Total expenditure £39.33k £33.26k £97.59k £38.64k £75.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.90k £1.47k N/A N/A