Trustees THE SAMARITANS OF DORSET AT WEYMOUTH

Charity number: 1168117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mike Gratwick Trustee 17 September 2024
None on record
Rebecca Jeffery Trustee 18 July 2023
None on record
Phillip Perkins Trustee 16 February 2023
None on record
Ian Hyslop Trustee 10 October 2020
None on record
Angela Watson Trustee 10 October 2020
None on record
Carol Susan Stuart Trustee 22 September 2020
None on record