Financial history CAYTHORPE WAR MEMORIAL HALL

Charity Number: 508583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £11.69k £797 £9.71k £6.57k £9.05k
Total expenditure £2.82k £2.78k £4.62k £6.87k £7.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A