Financial history FRIENDS OF HIGH VIEW

Charity number: 1169196
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £8.74k £5.17k £358 £0 £0
Total expenditure £9.25k £4.50k £7.00k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A