Accounts and annual returns THE LANCASHIRE AND CHESHIRE ENTOMOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 508729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 22 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 October 2024 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 October 2024 480 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 October 2024 845 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required