Trustees THE LANCASHIRE AND CHESHIRE ENTOMOLOGICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 508729

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Brash | Chair | 19 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Hedges | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harold Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
stephen mcwilliam | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
jonathan delf | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr michael hull | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP BRIGHTON | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marion Barlow | Trustee | 25 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hillyer | Trustee | 25 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID POYNTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr IAN WALLACE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CARL CLEE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID W EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr STEVEN JUDD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.