Financial history LOUISE AND SARAH MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1170916
Charity reporting is overdue by 123 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023
Total gross income £21.13k £8.11k £1.78k £1.00k £3.00k
Total expenditure £23.03k £4.54k £1.67k £2.55k £888
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A