Trustees OUR VILLAGES CRAWCROOK AND GREENSIDE CIO
Charity Number: 1173252

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Thomas Beer | Chair | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Chappell | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Gavin | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Alexandra Henderson | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Calvin Broderick | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Norma Blackith | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jane Clark | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE MARGARET JAMES | Trustee | 02 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA JOYCE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 02 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.