Financial history DALSTON VICTORY HALL

Charity Number: 1171079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £18.75k £26.84k £137.23k £25.90k £26.74k
Total expenditure £36.28k £9.25k £94.49k £20.71k £18.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.83k £18.57k £12.10k £1.20k N/A